This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:48:19 (UTC).

In the Matter of Jenny Nguyen

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 In the Matter of Jenny Nguyen was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Emede, Julie A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5804

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nguyen, Jenny Ngoc-Yen

Minors

Pham, Victor Quoc-Tam

Pham, Mary-Ann

Pham, Francis Quoc-Chi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Decree: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Name Change - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Affidavit: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Order to Show Cause: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minor's Consent to Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Petition: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less