Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:00:50 (UTC).

The Kazuo Utsonomiya Trust dated 1/12/15

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 The Kazuo Utsonomiya Trust dated 1/12/15 was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pichon, Rise Jones and Emede, Julie A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3723

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pichon, Rise Jones

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

White, Nanci Takagi

Respondent

Takagi, Haruye

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

Tomita, Stanley Tadao

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to determine ownership of property (Stanley T. Tomita 408-286-3775) C/F 8/24/18, 11/8/18, 1/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • *Stat Closure: PR Judgment/Final Determination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Order - Comment: Detemining Ownership of Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: Notice of Hearing and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to determine ownership of property (Stanley T. Tomita 408-286-3775) C/F 8/24/18, 11/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 1/31/19Notice of Hearing with Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of service (Original Notice)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Party's Motion; Comment: to determine ownership of property (Stanley T. Tomita 408-286-3775) C/F 8/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 11-8-18 Declaration in Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 11-21-18 Declaration Support Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 11-21-18 Notice Declaration Support of Pet w/ POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Petition: Amended - Comment: HRG 11/8/18 Petition 2nd (no notice of hearing for this amended petn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Hearing: Petition - Judicial Officer: Pichon, Rise Jones; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Party's Motion; Comment: to determine ownership of property (Stanley T. Tomita 408-286-3775)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: HRG 8/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 8-24-18 Notice of Petition to Determine Ownership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition - Comment: HRG 8-24-18 Petition to Determine Ownership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less