This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 22:46:54 (UTC).

Ibrahim Yilmaz and Latifa C. Yilmaz

Case Summary

On 06/09/2014 Ibrahim Yilmaz and Latifa C Yilmaz was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph, Irwin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2240

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joseph, Irwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ibrahim Yilmaz

Petitioner

Yilmaz, Ibrahim

Defendant

Latifa Chattat Yilmaz

Respondent

Yilmaz, Latifa Chattat

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven E. Springer

16360 Monterey Street, Suite 180

Morgan Hill, CA 95037-5488

Petitioner Attorney

Springer, Steven E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal (CV, FL); Party: Name: Yilmaz, Latifa Chattat; Party: Name: Yilmaz, Ibrahim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 11/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = Dismissed per Stip and Order. Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Entire W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: dismiaal of 514 FL 002240 and 114 DV 017961. Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order-No Fee Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar, no appearance; Comment: Text = Set per petition filed 6-9-14 gj.c/f 7-8-14 mins (114dv017961),ry Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 10/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Future Month; Comment: Text = Set per petition filed 6-9-14 gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 07/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Other - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = Demand for service of Preliminary Decl of Disclosure per CFC 2014(f) and 2107(a) Legacy Name = FL Other... Decision = M Closed = 08/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Response: Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • Notice: Limited Scope Representation - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = w/pos Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Ltd Scope of Representation Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 07/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Text = re: FL-110, FL-100, FM-1051, FM-1050 Legacy Name = FL Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 06/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution no minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 06/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less