This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 21:17:07 (UTC).

I. Likhatchev, et al vs Glencrest Patios Owner's Association

Case Summary

On 02/09/2009 I Likhatchev filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Glencrest Patios Owner's Association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2840

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Igor Likhatchev

San Jose, CA 95120

Irene Borz

San Jose, CA 95120

Likhatchev, Igor

Borz, Irene

Likhatchev, Gary

Defendant

Glencrest Patios Owner'S Association

77 Las Colinas Lane

San Jose, CA 95119

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Glencrest Patios Owner's Association; Party: Name: Borz, Irene; Party: Name: Likhatchev, Igor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Glencrest Patios Owner's Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Borz, Irene; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Likhatchev, Igor; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Glencrest Patios Owner's Association; Awarded Against: Likhatchev, Igor; Comment: printdate=Aug 27 2009; freetext=Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Aug 27 2009; judgstatusdate=Aug 27 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Glencrest Patios Owner's Association; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Borz, Irene; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Likhatchev, Igor; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 08/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 08/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Change of Address - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Change/Correct Address Decision = M Closed = 08/31/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = FW - Weiss, Franklyn Result Date = 06/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = personal service of plaintiff's claim to Perter Kelly, Pres. for Glencrest Patio's Owners Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Off calendar: no service - reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 04/14/2009 Log Note Text = {EvtCD=SC01; Jdg=286; HdrDtm=2009/04/14 1123pm; Notes=none; },

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 02/09/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $1715.45 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 04/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less