This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2022 at 20:40:47 (UTC).

I. Kohleriter, et al vs Phillip Turturici Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2008 I Kohleriter, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Phillip Turturici Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1178

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ilise Kohleriter

Kevin Kohleriter

Defendant

Phillip Turturici Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2009
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of Mailing; Filed By: Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = Mailed Order for Satisfaction of Judgment by Judgment Debtor Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • DocketDescription: Satisfaction; Filed By: Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = Court Order - The Court having considered the request and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Satisfaction of judgment be entered herein. Legacy Name = SC Ord:Satisfaction of Jgmt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • DocketDescription: Document: Other; Filed By: Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = Request for Satisfaction of Judgment by Judgment Debtor Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 02/18/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • HearingDescription: Trial De Novo; Department: Department 2; Time: 8:45AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Filed By: Ilise Kohleriter, Kevin Kohleriter, Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = PLT ILISE AND KEVIN KOHLERITER TO RECOVER FROM PHILLIP TURTURICI, INC. $3,150.00 PLUS $95.00 IN COSTS FOR A TOTAL JUDGEMENT OF $3,245.00 - SIGNED BY JUDGE ELFVING Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = G Closed = 02/18/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2009
  • DocketDescription: Judgment; Filed By: Ilise Kohleriter, Kevin Kohleriter, Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = PLT ILISE AND KEVIN KOHLERITER TO RECOVER FROM PHILLIP TURTURICI, INC. $3,150.00 PLUS $95.00 IN COSTS FOR A TOTAL JUDGEMENT OF $3,245.00 - SIGNED BY JUDGE ELFVING Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = G Closed = 02/18/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2008
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Notice; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 12/26/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Appeal (Small Claims); Filed By: Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 57; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Kevin Kohleriter,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DocketDescription: Order: Submitted Matter; Filed By: Ilise Kohleriter, Kevin Kohleriter, Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = Defendant shall pay plaintiff $3000.00 principal and $95.00 costs on plaintiff's claim. Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Ilise Kohleriter, Kevin Kohleriter, Phillip Turturici Inc.,; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000; Filed By: Ilise Kohleriter,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 10/24/2008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less