Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 15:25:25 (UTC).

I. Hatami vs R. Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/25/2009 I Hatami filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R Garcia. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zepeda, Carrie and Pahl, Penelope. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5060

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zepeda, Carrie

Pahl, Penelope

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Iman Hatami

San Jose, CA 95132

Hatami, Iman

Defendants

Raul Garcia

San Jose, CA 95116

Shift Transmissions

Garcia, Raul

SHIFTTRANSMISSIONS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Garcia, Raul; Party: Name: Hatami, Iman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pahl, Penelope; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Garcia, Raul; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Hatami, Iman; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Hatami, Iman; Judgment Amount: $3,316.35; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Garcia, Raul; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $3,231.35; Total: $3316.35; Comment: clerkid=275; printdate=Sep 24 2009; origjudgdate=Sep 15 2009; judgstatusdate=Sep 24 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Garcia, Raul; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Hatami, Iman; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 12/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Zepeda, Carrie; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Dismissed: Appeal; Comment: Text = JUDGMENT OF 9-15-09 REMAINS IN EFFECT Result By = C Result Judge = CZ - Zepeda, Carrie Result Date = 12/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = PP - Pahl, Penelope Result Date = 08/26/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 09/24/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = $6,962.38 damage to vehicle in shop 2/09-3/09 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2009

    Read MoreRead Less