This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 18:04:40 (UTC).

Hunter v. FCA US LLC (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Hunter filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FCA US LLC Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3295

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Hunter

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel Dashiell Smith

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/20/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/20/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/20/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

9/20/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

9/21/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

10/25/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Notice

11/2/2022 Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: FCA US LLC,; Comment: Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Eric Hunter,; Comment: Proof of Service Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Eric Hunter,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Eric Hunter,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Eric Hunter,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 2/8/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 2/8/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara