This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 20:45:08 (UTC).

Hummel, Et Al. V. Castle Principles, LLC, Et Al.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2012 Hummel filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Castle Principles, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter, Manoukian, Socrates P, Elfving, William J, McKenney, Kevin E, Strickland, Elizabeth, Folan, Maureen A and Kleinberg, James P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3170

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Manoukian, Socrates P

Elfving, William J

McKenney, Kevin E

Strickland, Elizabeth

Folan, Maureen A

Kleinberg, James P

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Muonio, Helen

Chu, Dean

Haverty, Michael

Gardner, Debra

Wu, Christina

Muonio, Andrew

Chiang, Claudia

Gardner, Jeffrey

Feth, Stefan

Li, Nan

Muscatine, Jeffrey

Hummel, Linda

Nguyen, Thao

Kim, David Y

Hummel, Joseph

Stevens, Charles

Gator Tech Integration, Inc.

CRS Drywall, Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

St. Thomas Construction Co. INC.

Castle Companies, INC. Builders And Developers

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kasdan, Kenneth S

Bennett, David H.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Miller, Craig S.

Other Attorneys

Archer Norris APC

Thomson, Scott J.

Home, III, W. Stuart

Mackey, Scott M., Esq.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = WJE - Elfving, William Result Date = 01/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Dismissal Without Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint as to Certain Cross-Defendant Plaintiffs only and Proof of Service (Atty K. Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint as to Cross-Defendant West Dana Place Owners Association only and Proof of Service (Atty Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Dismissal With Prejudice of the Cross-Complaint as to Certain Cross-Defendant Plaintiffs only and Proof of Service (Atty Kelly T. Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Beutler Corp. (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Petersen-Dean, Inc. (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Jose Delgadillo (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Hadi Shalmani (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Homesite Services Inc. (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = as to X-Def Fidel M. Del Real (Boruszewski) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
456 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2012
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = Atty Sperandio #G-44274 Legacy Name = CV Complex Answer Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-43012 Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/17/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-42802 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Order Decision = M Closed = 05/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = #G-42776 signed by Judge James P. Kleinberg Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 05/09/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, James P; Comment: Text = K. S. Kasdan Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 05/04/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Text = #2,#7,#9,#10 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 04/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 04/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Castle Companies, INC. Builders And Developers is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. THOMAS CONSTRUCTION,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CRS Drywall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GATOR TECH INTERGRATION, INC. is a litigant