This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:14 (UTC).

Humberto Loureiro vs Jose Mendoza

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Humberto Loureiro filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jose Mendoza. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1821

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loureiro, Humberto John

Defendant

Mendoza, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rothschild, Douglas A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Loureiro, Humberto John; Mendoza, Jose; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: HRG 07/24/18 Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less