This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 00:54:41 (UTC).

HUEY-LIN KWEI et al vs SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 HUEY-LIN KWEI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6283

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUEY-LIN KWEI

LONG KWEI

Defendant

SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

X. Young Lai

Defendant Attorneys

Corey M. Timpson

Ganette Mary-Marie Genetti

 

Court Documents

Review: Case Status

5/11/2023 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

5/11/2023 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

5/11/2023 Review: Case Status

Clerk Rejection Letter

9/20/2022 Clerk Rejection Letter

Minute Order

8/19/2022 Minute Order

Notice

8/12/2022 Notice

Appeal: Notice of Completion

8/11/2022 Appeal: Notice of Completion

Appeal: Receipt for Record

8/11/2022 Appeal: Receipt for Record

Notice: Remote Appearance

8/9/2022 Notice: Remote Appearance

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/12/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/12/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/22/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/22/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Motion: Compel Arbitration

3/22/2022 Motion: Compel Arbitration

Declaration: In Support

3/22/2022 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

3/22/2022 Declaration: In Support

Request: Judicial Notice

3/22/2022 Request: Judicial Notice

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 16; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,; Comment: EN#9639070 Notice of posting jury fees - not filed per limitation of filing papers. $150 not attached.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,; Comment: OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Notice of Completion; Comment: H050233

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Appeal: Receipt for Record; Comment: H050233

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Remote Appearance; Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,; Comment: Hearing 8/1/22, at 1:30 p.m., Dept. 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: SAN JOSE WATER COMPANY,; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Compel Arbitration; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,; Comment: Hrg 5-31-22 D2 Atty Lai, Hearing tbd (Per Filers comment - CCP 1290.2/1291.2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,; Comment: of Long Kwei

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,; Comment: of Plaintiffs' Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: HUEY-LIN KWEI, LONG KWEI,; Comment: RE: Statement of Decision for MTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less