This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/04/2022 at 04:02:07 (UTC).

HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. vs D. Bateh

Case Summary

On 04/08/2010 HSBC Bank Nevada, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against D Bateh. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Toff, Ronald I and McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4863

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Toff, Ronald I

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hsbc Bank Nevada, N.A.

Defendants

Deborah L Bateh

Bateh, Deborah L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D. Walsh

5030 Camino De La Siesta, Suite 340

San Diego, CA 92108

Walsh, Mark D.

Mark D Walsh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2013
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = Sacramento, issued 11/09/11 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 08/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = Sacramento $2,422.32 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = cost-$77.00, credit-$0.00, interest-$158.71 mailed 05/04/12 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 06/04/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = $2,186.61 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/19/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order to Show Cause; Department: Department 105; Time: 9:15AM; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = only as to does 1 to 10. Atty Walsh Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Interest; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summary of Case; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summary of Case Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = of P&A supporting a clerk judgment Legacy Name = CV Memorandum Decision = M Closed = 07/29/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2011
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order to Show Cause; Department: Department 105; Time: 9:15AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2010
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 06/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 05/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Non-Service; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Non-Service Decision = M Closed = 04/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Text = of venue Legacy Name = CV Affidavit Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A., Deborah Bateh,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC BANK NEVADA NATIONAL ASSN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH