This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 19:06:51 (UTC).

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association et al vs All Persons Interested in the matter of San Jose Ordinance No. 30716, et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association filed an Other lawsuit against All Persons Interested in the matter of San Jose Ordinance No 30716,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5596

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

James Barry

George Arrington

Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association

Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation

Defendants

All Persons Interested in the matter of San Jose Ordinance No. 30716,

City of San Jose

Golden State Second Amendment Council

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy Arthur Bittle

Defendant Attorney

Jason Adrian Bezis

 

Court Documents

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

12/20/2022 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/3/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Removal to Federal Court

4/15/2022 Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service: Electronic

4/14/2022 Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/14/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order: Ex Parte

3/25/2022 Order: Ex Parte

Proof of Service

3/24/2022 Proof of Service

Notice

3/24/2022 Notice

Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

3/24/2022 Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

Opposition/Objections

3/22/2022 Opposition/Objections

Request: Judicial Notice

3/22/2022 Request: Judicial Notice

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/7/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/7/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/18/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/7/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Restored to court's control

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Golden State Second Amendment Council,; Comment: to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: All Persons Interested in the matter of San Jose Ordinance No. 30716, , City of San Jose,; Comment: DEFENDANT CITY OF SAN JOSE???S NOTICE OF THE FILING OF A NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Proof of Published Service of Summons on "All Persons Interested"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: Timothy Bittle, Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: GRANTED Order Approving Publication of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Timothy Bittle, Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application - Notice Required; Filed By: Timothy Bittle, Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: for Order Approving Publication of Summons; Declaration of Timothy Bittle; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: City of San Jose,; Comment: to Ex Parte Application for Order Approving Publication of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: City of San Jose,; Comment: In Support of Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order Approving Publication of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Complaint to Invalidate Sections 10.32.215 and 10.32.230(B) of Chapter 10.32 of Title 10 of the San Jose Municipal Code

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association, James Barry, George Arrington, Silicon Valley Taxpayers Association, Silicon Valley Public Accountability Foundation,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less