This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 17:43:58 (UTC).

Horna Alcantara v. Lugg, Inc. (Class Action/PAGA)

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Horna Alcantara filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Lugg, Inc Class Action/PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7317

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jorge Antonio Horna Alcantara

Defendant

Lugg, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Caleb Lucas-Hansen Marker

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/23/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/23/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Lawsuit Notice

11/29/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/30/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/5/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/19/23 at 2:30pm in D3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Jorge Horna Alcantara,; Comment: PAGA Enforcement Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Jorge Horna Alcantara,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Jorge Horna Alcantara,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUGG INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara