This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 00:35:05 (UTC).

HONG CHEN et al vs RONALD PO et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 HONG CHEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RONALD PO. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Folan, Maureen A and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6574

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Folan, Maureen A

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LU, SIQING

CHEN, HONG

HONG CHEN

SIQING LU

Defendants

CAPSTONE EDUCATIONAL GROUP LIMITED

PO, RONALD WING-HONG

XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-3

RONALD WING-HONG PO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hu, Yitai

Yitai Hu

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/24/2021 Minute Order

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

10/15/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/15/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed

10/15/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Minute Order

9/8/2020 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/1/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/1/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

5/7/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/7/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Summons: Issued/Filed

5/7/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/18/2021 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/18/2021 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,; Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 6; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: HONG CHEN, SIQING LU,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS is a litigant