This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:31:17 (UTC).

HIRH Prince William Bullock: III Stewart (C) vs Garry Barbadillo et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 HIRH Prince William Bullock III Stewart C filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Garry Barbadillo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1862

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HIRH Prince William Bullock: III Stewart (C)

Stewart, William Bullock

Defendants

Barbadillo, Garry D.

Griswold, Timothy A.

Brooks, Kenneth Cleon

Madnawat, Rajeev Kumar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Griswold, Timothy A

Brooks, Kenneth C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: HIRH Prince William Bullock: III Stewart (C); Barbadillo, Garry D.; Madnawat, Rajeev Kumar; Griswold, Timothy A.; Brooks, Kenneth Cleon; Comment: without prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: **OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL FILED ON 04/23/18* *continued from 05/01/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Motion: Quash - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Service of Summons by Def Rajeev Madnawat (In Pro Per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Motion: Quash - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Service of Summons by Def Kenneth Brooks (In Pro Per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Demand - Comment: Plaintiff HIRH Prince William Bullock III Stewart's Demand and Command to Remove Dismissed Isntant Case from Law and Motion Caldendar. Pro Se

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Hearing: Motion to Strike - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: [Anti-SLAPP] the Complaint by Defs Garry Barbadillo and Timothy Griswold (Timothy Griswold)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • Complaint: Amended - Comment: First Amended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less