Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 03:22:49 (UTC).

Hina Patel et al vs Del Siv, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 Hina Patel filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Del Siv, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5162

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patel, Hina

Mody, Daven

Defendants

Meineke Car Care

Del Siv, Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Party: Names: Patel, Hina; Del Siv, Inc.; Mody, Daven; Comment: Said action is therefore Dismissed With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Matter ordered reset/reserve in Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: Added 2nd Plt. only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less