This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:40 (UTC).

Hetal Shah vs Pinal Patel

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Hetal Shah filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pinal Patel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3557

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shah, Hetal Ambrish

Defendant

Patel, Pinal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (No appearance by plaintiff. No proof of service. The court Dismisses the matter Without Prejudice.); Party: Names: Shah, Hetal Ambrish; Patel, Pinal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Letter received 5/11/18; supporting documents: The document requires a copy to be sent to the opposing party before it can be considered by the court. The case has been dismissed. ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $30.00. - No POS as of 04/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Same letter dated 4/05/18 received 4/09/18 & 4/10/18: The document requires a copy to be sent to the opposing party before it can be considered by the court. Letter did not state copy was sent to opposing party. If you wish to file a counter claim, you may submit form SC-120 along with filing fee.... ***View Document Return Form for full details.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less