This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 20:53:13 (UTC).

Hein v. Finisar Corporation, et al.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Hein filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Finisar Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kuhnle, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0510

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kuhnle, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hein, Herbert

Herbert Hein

Defendants

Simonet, Helene

II-VI Incorporated

Pardun, Tom

Rawls, Jerry S.

Hurlston, Michael

Dreyer, Michael L.

Stephens, Robert N.

Child, Michael C.

Finisar Corporation

Ferguson, Roger C.

Mutation Merger Sub, Inc.

Robert N. Stephens

Michael Hurlston

Michael C. Child

Roger C. Ferguson

Tom Pardun

Jerry S. Rawls

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Smith, Evan Jason

Evan Jason Smith

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Order

Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal: Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal - signed/TEK

Declaration

Evan J. Smith Declaration in support of Request for Voluntary Dismissal: Comment: Declaration of Evan J. Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal

Request

Request for Voluntary Dismissal: Comment: Request for Voluntary Dismissal

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Order to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint: Comment: Stipulation & Order to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint - signed/TEK

Stipulation and Order

Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order: Comment: Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Further Extend Defendants' Time To Respond To The Complaint

Stipulation

Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint: Comment: Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

Acknowledgement/Receipt

Notices and Acknowledgment of Receipt: Comment: Various

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice: Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/19/19 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

Civil Lawsuit Notice

1/4/2019 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/4/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/4/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/4/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

1/7/2019 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Acknowledgement/Receipt

1/23/2019 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Stipulation

2/14/2019 Stipulation

Stipulation and Order

3/8/2019 Stipulation and Order

Declaration

3/12/2019 Declaration

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal - signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Herbert Hein,; Comment: Declaration of Evan J. Smith in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: Herbert Hein,; Comment: Request for Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stipulation & Order to Further Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint - signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation; Filed By: Robert Stephens, Michael Hurlston, Michael Child, Roger Ferguson, Tom Pardun, Helene Simonet, Finisar Corporation,; Comment: Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Herbert Hein,; Comment: Various

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline signed/TEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/19/19 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Herbert Hein,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Herbert Hein,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Herbert Hein,; Comment: Class Action Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Aiding and Abetting Breach of Fiduciary Duty

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Finisar Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where II-VI INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara