This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 22:51:55 (UTC).

Hector Mendez et al vs Price-Simms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 Hector Mendez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Price-Simms, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5771

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hector Mendez

Primitivo Parra Medina

Armando Vargas Munoz

Defendants

Price-Simms, Inc.

Jorge Garcia Salazar

Jorge Salazar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allan Alcon Villanueva

Defendant Attorney

Allison Lauren Shrallow

 

Court Documents

Conference: Trial Setting

11/22/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/22/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/22/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Trial Setting

11/22/2022 Conference: Trial Setting

Conference: Settlement

6/14/2023 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

6/14/2023 Conference: Settlement

Conference: Settlement

6/14/2023 Conference: Settlement

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/7/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Conference: Case Management

1/14/2020 Conference: Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

9/27/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/27/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/10/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

1/10/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Statement: Case Management Conference

1/10/2020 Statement: Case Management Conference

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

1/14/2020 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Minute Order

1/14/2020 Minute Order

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Court Trial: Long Cause; Department: Department 6; Time: 8:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Settlement; Department: Department 6; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Admissions Deemed Admitted; Department: Department 6; Time: 9:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Price-Simms, Inc., Jorge Salazar,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Price-Simms, Inc., Jorge Salazar,; Comment: Hrg. 1/19/2023; AMENDED NOTICE OF DEFENDANT???S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET TWO) BE DEEMED ADMITTED (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Price-Simms, Inc., Jorge Salazar,; Comment: DECLARATION OF BRITTANY A. VULCAN IN SUPPORT OF COURT???S SEPTEMBER 6, 2022 MINUTE ORDER REQUESTING OSC BY COUNSEL (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Price-Simms, Inc., Jorge Salazar,; Comment: Declaration of Brittany a. Vulcan in Support of Defendant???s Motion for an Order Deeming Requests for Admission (Set Two) Be Deemed Admitted (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: Price-Simms, Inc., Jorge Salazar,; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant???s Motion for an Order Deeming Requests for Admission (Set Two) Be Deemed Admitted (Memos)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 8; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,; Comment: First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,; Comment: Amended Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Hector Mendez, Primitivo Medina, Armando Munoz,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Price Simms Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILLANUEVA, ALLAN A.