This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 12:50:42 (UTC).

Hector De La Cerda Vasquez vs Daniel Diaz et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Hector De La Cerda Vasquez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Daniel Diaz. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8058

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hector De La Cerda Vasquez

Defendants

Daniel Barrera Diaz

Prime Relocation Services, Inc.

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Martin Nykodym

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/1/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/10/2023 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Hector De La Cerda Vasquez,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Hector De La Cerda Vasquez,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Hector De La Cerda Vasquez,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Hector De La Cerda Vasquez,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less