This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:52:18 (UTC).

HC Structural Engineering Inc. vs Vivek Agrawal

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 HC Structural Engineering Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Vivek Agrawal. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6001

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HC Structural Engineering Inc.

Defendants

Agrawal, Vivek Kishore

Agrawal, Vivek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chow, Ron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: *continued from 06/04/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Ron Chow Re Stay Due to Agreement to Arbirate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 01/15/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Comment: Complaint for Money

    Read MoreRead Less