This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 23:46:05 (UTC).

Hardiman v. Johnson & Johnson, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 Hardiman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4911

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

on Behalf of the Estate of Barbara Lynn Perry Hardiman

Hardiman, Lamont

Defendants

Personal Care Products Counsel

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Luzenac America, Inc.

Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Cosmetic, Toiletry, and Fragrance Association

Other

Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abrams, Rachel

Other Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service: Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

Dismissal

Dismissal: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Personal Care Products Council only

Dismissal

Dismissal - with prej as to Personal Care Products Council: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Personal Care Products Council fka Cosmetic, Toilety and Fragrance Association only

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Comment: Personal Care Products Council fka Cosmetic, Toiletry and Fragrance Association

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Comment: Johnson & Johnson

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Comment: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Comment: Imerys Talc America, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service: Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Personal Care Products Council only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal - Dismissal - with prej as to Personal Care Products Council: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Personal Care Products Council fka Cosmetic, Toilety and Fragrance Association only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service: Comment: Personal Care Products Council fka Cosmetic, Toiletry and Fragrance Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service: Comment: Johnson & Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service: Comment: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service: Comment: Imerys Talc America, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Discovery stayed, as of 6/8/16, when the case was deemed complex.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Notice - Comment: Ruling on Petition for Coordination & Notice of Order Assigning Coord Trial Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Order - Comment: #G-85083 Order Staying Action Due to Pending Coordination Proceedings - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Notice - Comment: #G-85078 Notice of Submission of Potential Add-On Cases for Coordination of This Case Into JCCP 4872

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Comment: #G-84293 Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Clerk's Notice - Comment: #G-84025 CMC reset from 9/6/16 tp 9/9/16 by the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • Order - Comment: #G-84025 Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less