This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 13:41:19 (UTC).

Hao Zhang et al vs Capital Contractors, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 Hao Zhang filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Capital Contractors, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jiao, Meiguang

Zhang, Hao

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Capital Building Maintenance Services, Inc.

Capital Contractors, Inc.

RC Gomez Janitorial, Inc.

24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.

Capital Contractors, Inc. a NY Corporation

Defendant and Cross Defendant

RC Gomez Janitorial, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eichenbaum, Richard E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Masterson, Patrick J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Default Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less