This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 11:24:18 (UTC).

Hamid Kashaninejad vs Fataneh Kashaninejad

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Hamid Kashaninejad filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Fataneh Kashaninejad. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0237

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kashaninejad, Hamid S

Hamid S Kashaninejad

Claimant

Leotek Electronics USA 401 (K)

Respondents

Kashaninejad, Fataneh

Fataneh Kashaninejad

Not Classified By Court

Fidelity Investments Rollover IRA

Fidelity Investments ROTH IRA ending 4330

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Allan, Heather Murray

Heather Murray Allan

Respondent Attorneys

Mozaffar, Ramin

Betty Y Mac

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 76; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Fataneh Kashaninejad,; Comment: Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner; Filed By: Hamid Kashaninejad, Fataneh Kashaninejad,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Attorney Fees; Department: Department 76; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Hamid Kashaninejad,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Fataneh Kashaninejad,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Fataneh Kashaninejad,; Comment: Declaration of atty Ramin Mozaffar in support for atty fees and costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies); Filed By: Fataneh Kashaninejad,; Comment: SS; atty fees and costs; property control; petitioner to restore my health insurance he arbitrarily canceled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Fataneh Kashaninejad,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Hamid Kashaninejad,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEOTEK ELECTRONICS USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allan, Heather Murray