Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:04 (UTC).

HAIAU NGUYEN vs MICHAEL HUA

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 HAIAU NGUYEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL HUA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3043

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NGUYEN, HAIAU NGOC

Respondent

HUA, MICHAEL

Minor

HUA, ANGEL NGOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Petitioner Attorney

Miller, Raymond Roy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Set by agmt of parties at SOC held 11-27-18. slr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Stipulation & Order - No Fee - Comment: SOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon L. Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Miller 11/9 by agreement.-LV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: J.F. Cox

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Notice: Returned Check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Notice: Returned Check

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Insufficient Funds Returned Check - Comment: Check # E-file returned env #1775659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: fl 120 and fl 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act - Comment: Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Comment: Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less