Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 15:49:50 (UTC).

H. Johnson vs Hospital Corporation Of America Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2009 H Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Hospital Corporation Of America Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Murphy, Kevin J, Kirwan, Peter and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4913

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Murphy, Kevin J

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harry Johnson

Defendants

Regional Medical Center Of San Jose

Pawan Chawla

Robert B Filuk

Punam Kumari Gupta

Grace Khin-Khin Hmway Tee

Conwway Lien

Raj Kumar

Kieu Loan Nguyen

H. Walter Pepper

Kyle Kai Yu

Susan Alice Enlow

California Emergency Physicians Medical Group, A Professional Corporation

Hca Health Services Of California, Inc.

San Jose Healthcare System, Lp

Alice Enlow, M.D.

Andres Smith

Bing Shih Pao

Damon Nathan London

Jaime Benjamin Rivas

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moseley C. Collins

P.O. Box 5500

El Dorado Hills, CA 95762-5500

Defendant Attorneys

John P. Rhode

1000 "G" Street, 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Virgil F. Pryor

220 Montgomery Street, Suite 910

San Francisco, CA 94104

R. Wesley Pratt

1800

San Francisco, CA 94111-3993

Thomas E. Still

12901 Saratoga Avenue

Saratoga, CA 95070

Thomas J. Donnelly

201 North Civic Drive, Suite 239

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3879

George P. Galloway

1676 N. California Blvd., Suite 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-4183

Thomas A. Trapani

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Mario L. Beltramo, Jr.

Post Office Box 28912

Fresno, CA 93729-8912

Dominique A. Pollara

400 University Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95825-6502

David Sheuerman

1033 Willow Street

San Jose, CA 95125

Other Attorneys

D. Stuart Candland

915 San Ramon Valley, Suite 260

Danville, CA 94526

Collins, Moseley C.

Pryor, Virgil F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Name: San Jose Medical Clinic, Inc.; Party: Name: Johnson, Harry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Original Type: Jury Trial: Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Text = EST. 28 Days Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 11/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • Conference: Settlement Jury - Original Type: Conference: Settlement Jury; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 11/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = Atty. John P. Rhode. Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 12/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Text = dismissal of action due no appearance by all parties. Judge Murphy Legacy Name = CV Order Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • Notice: Dismissal of Action - Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV-Ntc:Dismissal of Action Decision = M Closed = 11/19/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard: Dismised; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 11/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Original Type: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Def Pawan Chawla M.D. and San Jose Medical Clinic, Inc. dba San Jose Medical Group, sued erroneously herein as San Jose Medical Group (Virgil Pryor) **Off Calendar per moving party, Mr. Pryor** Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 08/25/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Original Type: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication by Def Robert B. Filuk (Becky Cachia-Riedl) **Off Calendar per moving party, Mr. Zimmerman** Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 08/26/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Original Type: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Judicial Officer: Murphy, Kevin J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing); Comment: Text = Motion for Summary Adjudication by Def Punam Kumari Gupta (Thomas E. Still) **Off Calendar per moving party, Mr. Still** Result By = C Result Judge = KJM - Murphy, Kevin Result Date = 08/18/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2009
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = on 1st amended complaint Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = San Jose Healthcare System, LP is Doe 2, by atty Collins. *ff Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = HCA Health Services of California, Inc. is Doe 1, by atty Collins. *ff Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 08/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • Complaint: Amendment To (New Party) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = California Emergency Physicians Medical Group, a professional corporation is Doe 26, by Atty Collins. *ff Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/31/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = on first amended cross-complaint Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = on first amended cross-complaint Legacy Name = CV Summons Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = (Atty Collins) Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Jose Healthcare System, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER OF SAM JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HCA Health Services of California Inc is a litigant