This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2022 at 13:55:24 (UTC).

Granite State Insurance Company vs Center Line Construction, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2013 Granite State Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Center Line Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6891

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Granite State Insurance Company

Defendants

Center Line Construction, Inc.

Brasil, Jose Domingos

Mattson & Toombs Enterprises, Inc.

Hillside Drywall

Mirage Construction, Inc.

Jose Domingos Brasil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen P Bergen

650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Bergen, Stephen P

Stephen Paul Bergen

Defendant Attorneys

Blumberg, Jane S.

Long Blumberg

Jane Stacy Blumberg

Halvorsen, Michael R.

Michael Robert Halvorsen

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/15/2016 Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Center Line Construction, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Center Line Construction, Inc., Jose Brasil,; Comment: Partial w/ Prejudice as to Cross-Complaint Only (Jane S. Blumberg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company,; Comment: Can not process Request for Dismissal of Entire action with active Cross Complaint filed 10/5/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order; Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Mediation: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 8; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Vacated: settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company,; Comment: Text = unconditional Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Amended - summons-cross complaint Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc/Regular Mail Decision = M Closed = 10/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = an order of the court is required to file a 2nd amended complt. Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 10/05/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amendment To (New Party); Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company, Mirage Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = naming doe #1: "Mirage Construction, Inc." Legacy Name = CV Amendment to Complaint Decision = M Closed = 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 5; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = l. blumberg Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company,; Comment: Text = S. Bergen Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company, Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = t. gondo Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 01/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company, Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company, Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Granite State Insurance Company, Center Line Construction, Inc.,; Comment: Text = atty Bergen, 714 436 2700 Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 12/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIRAGE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where dba Hillside Drywall is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALVORSEN MICHAEL ROBERT