This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 23:57:38 (UTC).

G.P. Muggie & Sons, LLC vs Galen Wooten et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2016 G P Muggie Sons, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Galen Wooten. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7747

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G.P. Muggie & Sons, LLC

Defendants

Hammon Plating Corporation

Galen Wooten

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey S. Lawson

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Charles Pongracz

Wendi Ann Sorensen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court Lifted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: Hammon Plating Corporation,; Comment: Atty Pongracz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Galen Wooten,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Jeffrey Lawson, G.P. Muggie & Sons, LLC, Galen Wooten,; Comment: summons/comp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Jeffrey Lawson, G.P. Muggie & Sons, LLC, Hammon Plating Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee; Filed By: G.P. Muggie & Sons, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less