Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:31 (UTC).

Golden 1 Credit Union vs Elvia Ho

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Golden 1 Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Elvia Ho. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2300

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Golden 1 Credit Union

Defendants

Ho, Elvia

Ho, Elvia Noelia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Jennifer Arin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: Bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action - Comment: Notice Of Stay Of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less