Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:37:34 (UTC).

Gleb Finkelman vs Hyundai Motor America

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Gleb Finkelman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Zayner, Theodore C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2296

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Finkelman, Gleb

Defendant

Hyundai Motor America

Other

Theta Law Firm, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nita, M. Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

Tahsildoost, Soheyl

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Finkelman, Gleb; Hyundai Motor America; Theta Law Firm, LLP; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Nita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Nita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Pursuant to our Courts General Rules for E-Filing, we are unable to accept this document via mail. Please submit your documents to the court for processing via electronic filing. Visit the courts website at scscourt.org for more information on E-Filing. Thank you.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice - Comment: HRG 11/06/18 Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 11/06/18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NITA MARIAN NICHOLAS