This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 13:11:33 (UTC).

Gerardo Zepeda vs Alfa Machine Co, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2016 Gerardo Zepeda filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Alfa Machine Co, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9825

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zepeda, Gerardo

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Zazzle, Inc

Alfa Machine Co, Inc.

AMP a Fletcher Company

Fletcher Business Group

Fletcher-Terry Company LLC

a former division of Illinois Tool Works Inc. ("AMP")

ITW AMP

Cross Defendant

Alfa Machine Works, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

McNulty, Peter J.

Alvarez, John Anthony, Jr.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Budra, Michael K.

Dawson, Mark Lynn

Yee, Paul

SmithMoore, Kimberly Lou

Poole, David S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Comment: Partial w/o Prejudice as to Def Fletcher-Terry Company, LLC Only (Peter J. McNulty)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: Partial w/o Prejudice as to X-Def The Fletcher-Terry Company, LLC by X-Complt Zazzle, Inc. filed on 9-29-16 (Mark L. Dawson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: C/F 1-25-18 by Stip/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: For x-complt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Summons issued. Atty Budra.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Atty Budra.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Served Alfa Machine Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less