This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 12:47:05 (UTC).

Gene Kelly vs Ms. Shonna Swain

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Gene Kelly filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Ms Shonna Swain. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Jil, Steingart, Lisa and Janoff, Jeffrey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5954

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Jil

Steingart, Lisa

Janoff, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly, Gene

Defendant

Swain, Ms. Shonna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Kelly, Gene; Swain, Ms. Shonna; Comment: Plt. dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Janoff, Jeffrey; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Continued from 01/22/2019. Fee Paid $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Paid $45.00. Ordered reset in Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Order - Comment: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER: The next hearing date/time: 3/28/19, 8:30am, Dept 15. *view order for full details.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Affidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF CUSTODIAN OF BUSINESS RECORDS/WRITINGS OF PUBLIC ENTITY PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE. CODE 1530, et seq, 1561, et seq & 1560 et seq).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: POS on COD. Cert Mail. Hrg: 01/22/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Jil; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid: $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: Tracking #70180040000031189596 on Def's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Hrg: 11/20/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: Tracking #70161370000004704112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less