Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/25/2020 at 04:26:01 (UTC).

GEICO Indemnity Company vs Manuel Garcia-Lopez

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 GEICO Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Manuel Garcia-Lopez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Mikkelsen, Laurie, Pierce, Mark H, Barrett, Thang N and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6160

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Pierce, Mark H

Barrett, Thang N

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO Indemnity Company

Defendant

Garcia-Lopez, Manuel Armando

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aul, Katherine Rosemary

Aul, Katherine R.

Defendant Attorney

Law, Yuk Kwong

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DispositionJudgment - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: GEICO Indemnity Company; Garcia-Lopez, Manuel Armando; Comment: w/ Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketRequest: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketReview: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Barrett, Thang N; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Motion to Consolidate Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: to Complaint. Atty Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Comment: to Withdraw and Set Aside Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on Stip & Proposed Order to Withdraw and Set Aside Default

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketDefault Not Entered - Comment: Default was not previously entered. Therefore, we are unable to enter court judgment at this time. Please resubmit. E-SERVED 11-21-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketDefault Not Entered - Comment: (Mailed 10/10/19) Defendant name listed in Item 6B-2 does not match complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW YUK KWONG