This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/02/2023 at 19:34:22 (UTC).

GDK Enterprises, LLC vs Biovision, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 GDK Enterprises, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Biovision, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9066

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GDK Enterprises, LLC

Defendants

Biovision, Inc.

ABCAM PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cary Seth Kletter

Defendant Attorney

Judy Man-Ling Lam

 

Court Documents

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

8/31/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

8/31/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

8/31/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Review: Mediation Status

5/4/2023 Review: Mediation Status

Review: Mediation Status

5/4/2023 Review: Mediation Status

Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

5/5/2023 Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee

Minute Order

5/4/2023 Minute Order

Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

4/6/2023 Notice: Change Address/Firm Name

Minute Order

2/10/2023 Minute Order

Opposition/Objections

11/3/2022 Opposition/Objections

Declaration

11/3/2022 Declaration

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/9/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/9/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/9/2023 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Minute Order

10/19/2022 Minute Order

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

9/22/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/11/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

7/11/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee; Filed By: Biovision, Inc., ABCAM PLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Mediation Status; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:30AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Change Address/Firm Name; Filed By: Biovision, Inc., ABCAM PLC,; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Referral: Mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Opposition to Dismissal (Oppositions)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Declaration of Cary Kletter in Opposition to Dismissal (Declarations)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Biovision, Inc., ABCAM PLC,; Comment: ANSWER BY DEFENDANTS BIOVISION, INC., AND ABCAM PLC, TO COMPLAINT OF GDK ENTERPRISES, LLC (Answers)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint - BioVision (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GDK Enterprises, LLC,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less