This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 04:28:28 (UTC).

GCFS, Inc. vs A. Hurtado

Case Summary

On 03/03/2009 GCFS, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A Hurtado. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramon, Hector E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3656

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ramon, Hector E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCFS, Inc.

Defendants

Hurtado, Anna T.

Anna T. Hurtado

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nelson, Burke H.

Peterson, Brent David

Brent David Peterson

Burke H Nelson

 

Court Documents

Writ: Execution (Filed)

1/2/2019 Writ: Execution (Filed)

Writ: Execution (Filed)

11/5/2018 Writ: Execution (Filed)

Judgment: Satisfaction

6/15/2018 Judgment: Satisfaction

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: GCFS, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Los Angeles, issued 06/15/17, partial $5,713.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Satisfaction; Filed By: GCFS, Inc.,; Comment: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Costs: $663.00; Interest: $3,570.99 Date of mailing: 06/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: GCFS, Inc.,; Comment: Los Angeles, $8,406.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: GCFS, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Cost: 663; interest: $2794.66; date of mailing: 11/2/15. Atty Hushing-Kline. Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = LA, $4,147.87 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 03/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = LA, $4,147.87 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = re Costs:428.00, Interest: $2,407.34 (Atty B. Hushing-Kline) mail out on 1/08/15 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 01/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = Sacramento; issued 12/31/13;$6783.83 deficit Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 11/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = without prejudice; does 1-5 only. (Atty Parkinson) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Interest; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 1033; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: CCP 585; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 06/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Ltd/reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = Re: Venue Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: GCFS, Inc., Anna Hurtado,; Comment: Text = Re: Reduction in filing fees Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCFS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL DEPARTMENT OF GCFS, INC. - BURKE H. NELSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON BRENT D