This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 07:12:17 (UTC).

Garza, et al. v. Board of Trustees of The San Jose Unified School District, et al.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Garza, filed an Other lawsuit against Board of Trustees of The San Jose Unified School District,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3532

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SHARON CALHOUN

REBECCA GARZA

JANET FISH

Respondents

NANCY ALBARRAN

SAN JOSE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SAN JOSE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Sonja Jean Woodward

Andrew Joseph Kahn

Respondent Attorneys

Amy Rose Levine

Ingrid Alise Meyers

Nicole L Phillips

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

6/17/2019 Stipulation and Order

Order: Deeming Case Complex

6/13/2019 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order

6/7/2019 Order

Stipulation and Order

4/10/2019 Stipulation and Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/5/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/5/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

4/5/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Clerk Rejection Letter

3/4/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/19/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

2/19/2019 Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stipulation & Order for Arbitration - signed/BCW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex signed/BCW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to D1, Hon. Brian C. Walsh presiding, for all purposes; resets certain hearing dates; sets CMC for 9/13/19 at 10am in D1 - signed/BCW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: NANCY ALBARRAN, SAN JOSE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SAN JOSE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT,; Comment: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing and Service of Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. The Order was NOT signed by the Court; on 6/17/19, the Court entered a Stipulation & Order for Arbitration and matter was stayed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint-N.Albarran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint-Board of Trustees of SJUSD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint-San Jose Unified School District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,; Comment: ENV#2580910 / CLN: No CMC hearing set for petitions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Petition (Unlimited) (No Fee); Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,; Comment: Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: SHARON CALHOUN, REBECCA GARZA, JANET FISH,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less