This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 04:01:44 (UTC).

Garden Court Hotel Vs Teres McClen LLC

Case Summary

On 07/05/2012 Garden Court Hotel filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Teres McClen LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lin, Wen-Ching and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8864

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lin, Wen-Ching

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garden Court Hotel

520 Cowper Street

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Defendants

Teres McClen Company

Teres McClen Llc

555 Capital Mall

Sacramento, CA 95814

Business Filings Inc.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Business Filings Inc.; Party: Name: Teres McClen LLC; Party: Name: Garden Court Hotel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Teres McClen LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Garden Court Hotel; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Garden Court Hotel; Judgment Amount: $7,875.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Teres McClen LLC; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $375.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7875.00; Comment: printdate=Jan 11 2013; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Nov 1 2012; judgstatusdate=Jan 11 2013; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Teres McClen LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Garden Court Hotel; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Garden Court Hotel; Judgment Amount: $7,875.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Teres McClen LLC; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $375.00; Other: $7,500.00; Total: $7875.00; Comment: printdate=Nov 9 2012; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Nov 1 2012; judgstatusdate=Nov 9 2012; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Teres McClen LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Garden Court Hotel; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec/Rtn Unsatis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Lin, Wen-Ching; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard: Denied; Comment: Text = original judgment of 11/01/12 remains Result By = C Result Judge = WCL - Lin, Wen-Ching Result Date = 01/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 12/07/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = notice of hearing Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = request to continue motion to vacate granted. Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 12/07/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2012
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = check #1159 for $10 returned to defendant. request for continuance granted out of court. Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = request for telephonic appearance denied 11/01/12 Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 11/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/01/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Lin, Wen-Ching; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = D Result Judge = WCL - Lin, Wen-Ching Result Date = 09/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $7501-$10000 Decision = M Closed = 09/11/2012

    Read MoreRead Less