This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 10:39:01 (UTC).

GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX et al vs CITY OF SAN JOSE et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 GARDEN CITY, INC dba CASINO M8TRIX filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF SAN JOSE. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6617

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation

Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101

Blackstone Gaming LLC

Defendants

CITY OF SAN JOSE

CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian Thomas Hildreth

Hildreth, Brian Thomas

Christine Elizabeth Peek

Tracey Stevens Buck-Walsh

Defendant Attorneys

Yue-Han Chow

Chow, Yue-Han

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/18/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

2/14/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/1/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/29/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/29/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Request

3/1/2021 Request

Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

3/10/2021 Ex Parte Application - Notice Required

Request for Order to service/summons by post or publication

3/11/2021 Request for Order to service/summons by post or publication

Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

3/11/2021 Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies)

Order: Publication of Summons/Citation

3/11/2021 Order: Publication of Summons/Citation

Answer/Response (No Fee)

11/5/2021 Answer/Response (No Fee)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/5/2021 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101,; Comment: HRG 3-1-2022 Case Management Statement of Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Answer to Blackstone Gaming, LLC, atty Chow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Answer to Garden City's Complaint, Atty Chow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Answer Sutter's Place Complaint, atty: Chow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Ex Parte; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Stipulation to consolidate with case# 21CV377181 and 21CV377672 is GRANTED; All hearings shall be taken OFF CALENDAR except for a Case Management Conference on 3-01-22 at 10:00 AM in Dept. 7, signed Judge Rudy. [Env# 7592365]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Ex Parte Application FOR CONSOLIDATION CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum: Points and Authorities; Filed By: CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY COUNCIL OF SAN JOSE,; Comment: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Publication of Summons/Citation; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: GRANTED, signed Judge Rudy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application: Ex Parte (Fee Applies); Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: for an Order to extend time to serve by Plt (Brian Hildrech) *PENDING*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order to service/summons by post or publication; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: by Plt (Thomas W. Hiltack)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Re: publication of summons. Granted, signed Judge Rudy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application - Notice Required; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: for an Order Approving Form of And Publication of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Request for Clerk Seal on Summons for publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Verified Complaint for Declaratory Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: GARDEN CITY, INC. dba CASINO M8TRIX, a California Corporation,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant

Latest cases where City Council of San Jose is a litigant