This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:51:47 (UTC).

Garcia v. Fresno Plumbing & Heating, Inc. (Class Action/PAGA)

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Garcia filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Fresno Plumbing Heating, Inc Class Action/PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7272

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro Perez Garcia

Defendant

Fresno Plumbing & Heating, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua David Boxer

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

11/28/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

11/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

11/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

11/29/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

12/2/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 1; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Pedro Perez Garcia,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons [Fresno Plumbing & Heating]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Pedro Perez Garcia,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Pedro Perez Garcia,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Pedro Perez Garcia,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Proposed Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 4/13/23 at 2:30pm in D1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fresno Plumbing is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant