This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 07:49:08 (UTC).

GAIL MORALES vs GERARDO GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 GAIL MORALES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GERARDO GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9849

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAIL MORALES

Defendant

GERARDO MAGANA GUTIERREZ

 

Court Documents

Review: Case Status

6/2/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

6/2/2022 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

9/23/2021 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

9/23/2021 Review: Case Status

Conference: Further Case Management

3/16/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Hearing: Order to Show Cause

3/5/2020 Hearing: Order to Show Cause

Hearing: Order to Show Cause

3/5/2020 Hearing: Order to Show Cause

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

6/7/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

6/7/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order

9/17/2019 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/4/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Substitution: Attorney

3/4/2020 Substitution: Attorney

Minute Order

3/11/2020 Minute Order

Default Not Entered

3/9/2021 Default Not Entered

Request: Dismissal

3/9/2021 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

4/29/2021 Minute Order

Minute Order

9/24/2021 Minute Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Not Entered; Filed By: GAIL MORALES,; Comment: Defendant name on POS 010 filed on 03/04/20 does not match the name on the complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: GAIL MORALES,; Comment: DOES ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Not Entered; Filed By: GAIL MORALES, GERARDO GUTIERREZ,; Comment: Defendant name on POS 010 filed on 03/04/20 does not match the name on the complaint.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Order to Show Cause; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: GAIL MORALES, GERARDO GUTIERREZ,; Comment: served: Geerardo Magana Gutierrez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: GAIL MORALES,; Comment: Substitution of attorney -- civil (without court order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: GAIL MORALES,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less