This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 17:09:52 (UTC).

G. Nichols vs S. Lewis

Case Summary

On 07/12/2011 G Nichols filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against S Lewis. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Madden, James P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8154

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory F Nichols

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Nichols, Gregory F

Defendants

Shawn V Lewis

Sunnyvale, CA 94086

Lewis, Shawn V

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Orders Issued; Comment: Text = Consolidation with 111CV214688 Filed In Higher Jurisdiction Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 12/12/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2011
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amended Claim (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 11/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/19/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = plt amends compl prayer $1524 to $2069 - no fee change Legacy Name = SC Amended Claim (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 08/05/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC-Ntc to Appear in Court Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = letter from plaintiff submitted to commissioner james madden. per commissioner james madden- ok to consolidate all cases to 9/19/11. all notified by mail. Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 07/12/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 08/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less