This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 23:31:22 (UTC).

G. Mellberg vs D. Montgomery

Case Summary

On 06/02/2010 G Mellberg filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Montgomery. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Elfving, William J, Madden, James P and Sevey, James. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7207

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Elfving, William J

Madden, James P

Sevey, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gregory Mellberg

San Diego, CA 92130

Mellberg, Gregory

Defendants

Dawn Montgomery

Sunnyvale, CA 94088

Montgomery, Dawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Montgomery, Dawn; Party: Name: Mellberg, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Montgomery, Dawn; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mellberg, Gregory; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Mellberg, Gregory; Judgment Amount: $2,536.75; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Montgomery, Dawn; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $50.00; Other: $2,486.75; Total: $2536.75; Comment: printdate=Nov 2 2010; origjudgdate=Nov 2 2010; judgstatusdate=Nov 2 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Sevey, James; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Montgomery, Dawn; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mellberg, Gregory; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Mellberg, Gregory; Judgment Amount: $2,536.75; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Montgomery, Dawn; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $50.00; Other: $2,486.75; Total: $2536.75; Comment: printdate=Aug 6 2010; origjudgdate=Aug 2 2010; judgstatusdate=Aug 6 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Montgomery, Dawn; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mellberg, Gregory; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Certificate of Mailing - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Text = The court grants the motion to vacate Judgment. Judgment is set aside/trial de novo is submitted Result By = C Result Judge = WJE - Elfving, William Result Date = 10/29/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = it is ordered adjudged and decreed that judgment is rendered as flollows: Pltf/Rstp Gregory Mellberg recover from def/App Dawn montgomery $2,486.75 plus 450 in costs for a total Judgment of $2,536.75; signed by judge William J. Elfving Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = it is ordered adjudged and decreed that judgment is rendered as flollows: Pltf/Rstp Gregory Mellberg recover from def/App Dawn montgomery $2,486.75 plus 450 in costs for a total Judgment of $2,536.75; signed by judge William J. Elfving Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 11/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 09/13/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Heard: Denied; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 09/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = defendentfiles request for continuance Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl Closed = 09/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 08/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 07/01/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = defendent requests emgergency order to have their address deleted/sealed - per commissioner madden - granted. defendent notified by mail Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2010

    Read MoreRead Less