This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/24/2019 at 02:45:59 (UTC).

G. Kanouff vs Cole Family Trust

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 G Kanouff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cole Family Trust. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Persky, Aaron, Elfving, William J, McKenney, Kevin E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3001

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Persky, Aaron

Elfving, William J

McKenney, Kevin E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garrett Kanouff

Atascadero, CA 93422

Kanouff, Garrett

Defendant

Cole Family Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Tardiff, Mary Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Cole Family Trust; No Judgment Awarded; Awarded Against: Kanouff, Garrett; Party: Names: Kanouff, Garrett; Cole Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Documents submitted to the Court must be on pleading paper or appropriate Judicial Council Form, which can be found at www.scscourt.org.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Court Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Est. 1 Day - No MSC Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: C/F 8/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: 3rd cont. from 8-18-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: re; Def's 7-516 MSJ - DENIED by Judge Elfving

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Hearing: Motion Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: by Def Cole Family Trust (Mary Ann Tardiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2014
  • Default Not Entered - Judicial Officer: Elfving, William J; Comment: Text = Items 5a,b & c are incomplete. Items 6b(1) & 6b(2) are also incomplete. Legacy Name = CV Default Not Entered Decision = M Closed = 01/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = Re: Default Result By = C Result Judge = KEM - McKenney, Kevin Result Date = 11/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Original Type: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Set for:; Comment: Text = FTA as to plt, NSA/NTA for plt (plt's failure to appear may result in dismissal of the case) Result By = C Result Judge = KEM - McKenney, Kevin Result Date = 09/05/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM; Result: Set for: OSC/Dismissal; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = ES2 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 07/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2013
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/24/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 03/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 03/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/15/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE COLES FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARDIFF, MARY ANN