This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/02/2018 at 14:21:41 (UTC).

G. Dang vs M. Kharie, et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2006 G Dang filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M Kharie. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ritchey, Catherine and Madden, James P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3788

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ritchey, Catherine

Madden, James P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gurson S Dang

San Francisco, CA 94112

Dang, Gurson S

Defendants

Matin Kharie

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Shadi Razi

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

David Mojdeh

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Jay Zandari

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Sunnyvale Ford

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Kharie, Matin

Fuentes, Steve

Mojdeh, David

Zandari, Jay

Razi, Shadi

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Fuentes, Steve; Party: Name: Sunnyvale Ford; Party: Name: Zandari, Jay; Party: Name: Mojdeh, David; Party: Name: Razi, Shadi; Party: Name: Kharie, Matin; Party: Name: Dang, Gurson S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Sunnyvale Ford; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Zandari, Jay; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Mojdeh, David; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Razi, Shadi; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Kharie, Matin; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Dang, Gurson S; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Sunnyvale Ford; Awarded Against: Dang, Gurson S; Comment: printdate=Nov 28 2006; freetext=Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim.; origjudgdate=Nov 27 2006; judgstatusdate=Nov 28 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Zandari, Jay; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Mojdeh, David; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Razi, Shadi; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Kharie, Matin; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Dang, Gurson S; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 11/27/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Addl Plts and Defs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2006
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amend Plaintiff's Claim Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Ritchey, Catherine; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CR - Ritchey, Catherine Result Date = 10/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 09/12/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less