This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 15:16:48 (UTC).

Frontier Ford, Inc. vs T. Hayes

Case Summary

On 06/01/2009 Frontier Ford, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against T Hayes. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H and Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4705

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frontier Ford, Inc.

3701 Stevens Creek Blvd

Santa Clara, CA 95051

Defendants

Theresa Hayes

San Jose, CA 95112

Hayes, Theresa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2009
  • SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment - Original Type: SC Request to Correct or Vacate Judgment; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = defendant's motion to vacate the 10/16/09 default judgment Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 12/07/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 12/08/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • Motion: Set Aside/Vacate (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = defendant's motion to vacate the 10/16/09 default judgment Legacy Name = SC Ntc:Mtn to Vacate Jgmt/Decl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 10/16/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 10/22/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = P Result Judge = FB - Berry, Frank Result Date = 08/14/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Change of Address - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Change/Correct Address Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 07/07/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Req:Continuance/After Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pers serv Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim/13 or more claims Decision = M Closed = 06/03/2009

    Read MoreRead Less