This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 12:02:00 (UTC).

FRE 355, LLC vs Julian Maimin et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 FRE 355, LLC filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Julian Maimin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5234

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRE 355, LLC, A DELAWARE LLC db in CA AS FRE 355 INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC

FRE 355, LLC

Doing Business in California as FRE 355 Investment Group, LLC

Defendants

French, Nicholas Alexander

Sereno Group, Inc.

Scripps, Trustee , Kathryn A.

PLC INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company

Kaplan, Trustee, Judy Beth

S & R INCOME FUND II, LP, a Delaware Limited Partnership

RDG LENDER SERVICES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

Dromy, Trustee , Lauren

S & R INCOME FUND I, LP, a Delaware Limited Partnership

Maimin, Trustee, Julian

Scripps, Trustee , William H.

Maimin, Trustee, Stacey

Kaplan, Judy Beth

Trustee of the Scripps Family 1992 Revocable Trust U/A

Trustee of the Judi Beth Kaplan Living Trust Dated November 29, 2006

Scripps, Kathryn A.

S & R INCOME FUND II, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Finkelstein, David G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 2:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice: Pendency of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scripps, Trustee , Kathryn A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sereno Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where KAPLAN INC. is a litigant