Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 04:19:44 (UTC).

Frank Tsai et al vs Steven Dewade

Case Summary

On 06/28/2016 Frank Tsai filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Steven Dewade. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5255

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tsai, Susan

Tsai, Frank

Defendants

Dewade, Steven

Steve, Dewaide Robert

Dewaide, Steve

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Tsai, Frank; Tsai, Susan; Awarded Against: Dewade, Steven; Amount; Damages: $1,500.00; Costs: $110.00; Total: $1610.00; Party: Names: Tsai, Frank; Tsai, Susan; Dewade, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial Continued by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued by Court due to work stoppage: strike in effect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Cert Mail Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Certified Mail Returned Unclaimed - Comment: Green signature card not attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: POS amended claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less

    Read MoreRead Less