This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:02:10 (UTC).

Francisco J. Leon and Ester Contreras

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 Francisco J Leon and Ester Contreras was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pennypacker, Philip H and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2767

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Pennypacker, Philip H

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francisco Javier Leon

San Jose, CA 95119

Petitioner

Leon, Francisco Javier

Defendant

Ester Contreras

Respondent

Contreras, Ester

Minor

Contreras, Roman Leon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Leon, Francisco Javier; Contreras, Ester

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: Re: appointment of temporary judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Financial Statement (simplified)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: re: Ptn, summs, blank resp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: Bulk Scan 08-21-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 08/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less