This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 04:49:10 (UTC).

Four Seasons Home Products, Inc. vs A. Godbole

Case Summary

On 12/01/2014 Four Seasons Home Products, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against A Godbole. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3890

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Four Seasons Home Products, Inc.

Arati Godbole

Not Classified By Court

Neutral Ignascio G. Camarena, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Edward Francis Cullen

David H. Schwartz

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Ignascio G. Camarena

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/14/2016 Minute Order

Minute Order

7/21/2016 Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 22; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc.,; Comment: (atty: Edward Cullen)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Arati Godbole,; Comment: (atty: David Schwartz)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Trial Setting; Department: Department 7; Time: 11:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Opposition; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Decl of Edward F. Cullen in Oppos to Dismissal of Case; OSC Re Dismissal (E. Cullen) 11-05-15 @10:01am D2 Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • DocketDescription: Arbitration: Other Action; Comment: Text = Voucher approved for payment and sent to finance dept. Legacy Name = CV Other Arb Action Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc.,; Comment: Text = e. cullen Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 04/02/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • DocketDescription: Answer/Response (No Fee); Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Text = e. cullen Legacy Name = CV Answer - NO FEES DUE! Decision = M Closed = 03/05/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Text = answer to complaint, Cross Complaint, proof of service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc by Email Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Answer, Ltd >$10K Decision = M Closed = 02/09/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Text = served to Arati Godole Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Four Seasons Home Products, Inc., Arati Godbole,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 12/01/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less