This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 02:22:38 (UTC).

Foreman Financial, Inc. vs Jazmin Chaidez

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 Foreman Financial, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jazmin Chaidez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7462

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foreman Financial, Inc.

Defendant

Jazmin Sandoval Chaidez

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

6/9/2022 Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

6/9/2022 Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

7/21/2022 Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

Notice: Remote Appearance

7/21/2022 Notice: Remote Appearance

Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

7/29/2022 Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 1:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee); Filed By: Foreman Financial, Inc.,; Comment: reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Remote Appearance; Filed By: Foreman Financial, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Foreman Financial, Inc.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant